Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/07/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/08/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/11/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 05/11/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/11/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/16/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/17/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/25/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/06/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/10/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/18/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/05/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/14/2012