Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/30/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/31/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/31/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/31/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/31/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/31/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/31/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/31/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/05/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/05/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/05/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/05/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/05/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/05/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/05/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/05/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/05/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/05/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/05/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 06/05/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/06/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/06/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/08/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/08/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/18/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/18/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/18/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/18/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/19/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/19/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/21/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/21/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/28/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 06/28/2012