There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing 375 years of service of the National Guard and affirming congressional support for a permanent Operational Reserve as a component of the Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/10/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/08/2012Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (97)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/08/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/08/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/08/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/19/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/20/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/20/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/20/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 06/20/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/21/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/21/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/21/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/21/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/26/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/26/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/26/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 06/26/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/26/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/26/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/27/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/27/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/27/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 06/27/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/27/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/28/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/28/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/28/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/28/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 06/28/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/28/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/28/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/09/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/10/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/18/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/23/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/24/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/01/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/10/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/10/2012
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/11/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/12/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/13/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/13/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/19/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/19/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/19/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/19/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 09/19/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/19/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/20/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/20/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/21/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/08/2012 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel07/10/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.129. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2012)

Recognizes: (1) the critical importance of the Operational Reserve as a component of the Armed Forces, particularly as a means of preserving combat power during a time of budget austerity; and (2) the dual-status, state-federal National Guard as the foundation of the Operational Reserve and of military manpower.

Expresses support for making the Operational Reserve permanent.

Repudiates proposals to return the Reserve Components to a diminished or purely strategic role in national security.

Affirms the growth of the Operational Reserve as circumstances warrant.