There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for the acceptance of a statue of Gerald R. Ford from the people of Michigan for placement in the United States Capitol.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/16/2011Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1768; text as passed Senate: CR S1768)
03/14/2011Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 0 (Roll no. 176).(text: CR H1776)
03/08/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
03/17/2011SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/16/2011SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1768; text as passed Senate: CR S1768)
03/15/2011SenateReceived in the Senate.
03/14/2011-7:02pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/14/2011-7:02pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 396 - 0 (Roll no. 176). (text: CR H1776)
03/14/2011-6:55pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1779-1780)
03/14/2011-5:35pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/14/2011-5:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 27.
03/14/2011-5:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1776-1778)
03/14/2011-5:12pmHouseMr. Lungren, Daniel E. moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
03/08/2011HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
03/08/2011HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration03/08/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.27.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.27. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (03/16/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Accepts in the name of the United States the statue of Gerald R. Ford furnished by the people of Michigan for placement in the U.S. Capitol.

Tenders the thanks of Congress to the people of Michigan for providing this commemoration.

Authorizes Michigan to use the rotunda of the Capitol on May 3, 2011, for a presentation ceremony.