Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/09/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/16/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/16/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/30/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/01/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/02/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/07/2011