There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress regarding the freedom, security, and stability of Taiwan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/13/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/13/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/13/2011Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/13/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/04/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/04/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/10/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/11/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/12/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/01/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/21/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/21/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/21/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/21/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/23/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/23/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/23/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/23/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/24/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/11/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/11/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/13/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/13/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 07/13/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/18/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/28/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/13/2011 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific05/13/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.39.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.39. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/13/2011)

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) grave concerns exist concerning the ballistic missile deployment by the People's Republic of China (PRC) directed toward Taiwan which threatens security and stability in the Taiwan Strait, (2) the President should seek a renunciation from the PRC of any threat or use of force against Taiwan and the region, (3) Taiwan's future should be determined peacefully by its people and free from PRC coercion, and (4) the President should move forward with the sale to Taiwan of new and upgraded F-16s.