Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/13/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/13/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/15/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/03/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/17/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 04/18/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/19/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/30/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/18/2012