Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/07/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/07/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/14/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/19/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/21/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/13/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/17/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/25/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/31/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/15/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/24/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/24/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/24/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/07/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2012