Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/08/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/12/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/12/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/12/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/12/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/12/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/12/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/12/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/14/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/14/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/14/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/14/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/14/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/14/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/14/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/14/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/14/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/15/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/20/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 07/20/2011