Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/13/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 09/13/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/13/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/13/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/13/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/13/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/13/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/15/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/15/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/21/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/21/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/21/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/04/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/25/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/06/2011