Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/03/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/29/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/29/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/01/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 12/02/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/05/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/06/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/14/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/14/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/14/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/15/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/16/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/16/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/20/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 12/20/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 12/20/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/17/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/17/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 01/17/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/17/2012