Text: H.Con.Res.89 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/18/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. CON. RES. 89

Expressing the sense of the Congress regarding National Pearl Harbor Remembrance Day.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
November 18, 2011

Mr. Hall (for himself and Mr. Dingell) submitted the following concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

Expressing the sense of the Congress regarding National Pearl Harbor Remembrance Day.

Whereas, on December 7, 1941, minutes before 8 a.m., 353 members of the Imperial Japanese Navy and Air Force attacked units of the Armed Forces of the United States stationed at Pearl Harbor, Hawaii, without warning;

Whereas the bulk of the attack at Pearl Harbor lasted for approximately five hours, and 2,403 members of the Armed Forces of the United States perished in the attack, 1,247 more were wounded, and 57 civilians lost their lives;

Whereas Japanese forces mercilessly bombarded American servicemen in two waves, torpedoed American ships between San Francisco and Honolulu, and destroyed 188 U.S. aircraft, leaving devastation and chaos, though remarkably, American aircraft carriers survived unharmed;

Whereas President Franklin Delano Roosevelt declared the day of the attack on Pearl Harbor “a date which will live in infamy,” and Americans rose together in remembrance of their fallen countrymen with a commitment to defend the Nation against all aggressors;

Whereas the following day, on December 8, 1941, Congress declared war against Japan, and three days later against Germany, thus marking the beginning of a global conflict that would define a generation;

Whereas more than 320,000 American men sacrificed their lives to preserve the sacred freedoms of the United States, to cease forever the spread of Nazism through Europe and Imperialism by Japan;

Whereas nearly four years later, on September 2, 1945, after victory on the European front, World War II ended with the Japanese surrendering aboard the USS Missouri;

Whereas in 1950, Admiral Arthur Radford ordered that a flagpole be erected over the remains of the USS Arizona in Pearl Harbor;

Whereas the USS Arizona serves as the final resting place for many of the battleship’s 1,177 crew members who lost their lives on December 7, 1941;

Whereas the USS Arizona also serves as an educational site for citizens and international visitors alike, raising awareness about the event itself and the perils of war;

Whereas the terms of Japanese surrender fostered significant democratic reform, including ensuring the individual liberty and rights of the people of Japan;

Whereas the United States has moved beyond the tragedy of Pearl Harbor and in the years since the conclusion of World War II has formed a strong and valuable alliance with Japan, including military cooperation and bilateral trade;

Whereas the 70th anniversary of the attack on Pearl Harbor is on December 7, 2011; and

Whereas, on August 23, 1994, Public Law 103–308 was enacted (reenacted later as section 129 of title 36, United States Code) to designate December 7th of each year as National Pearl Harbor Remembrance Day and to request the President to issue each year a proclamation calling on the people of the United States to observe National Pearl Harbor Remembrance Day with appropriate ceremonies and activities and to urge all departments, agencies, and instrumentalities of the Federal Government, and interested organizations, groups, and individuals, to fly the flag of the United States at half-staff each December 7th in honor of the individuals who died as a result of their service at Pearl Harbor: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That Congress, on the occasion of the 70th anniversary of the December 7, 1941, attack on Pearl Harbor, Hawaii—

(1) pays tribute to the members of the Armed Forces of the United States and civilians who died in the attack;

(2) honors the thousands of men and women of the Armed Forces of the United States who paid the ultimate sacrifice and gave their lives in defense of freedom and liberty during World War II;

(3) acknowledges the continued peaceful and mutually beneficial relationship between the United States and Japan;

(4) appreciates the efforts of Japan as one of the most reliable security partners of the United States in the global war on terrorism; and

(5) encourages Japan to continue to develop strategic and economic policies, in partnership with the United States, that promote stability throughout Asia and reduce barriers in trade between the two nations.