Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/16/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/16/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/27/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/05/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/07/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/07/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/13/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/20/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/21/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/27/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/25/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/22/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/26/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/29/2012