Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/24/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/01/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 08/01/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 08/01/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/20/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/21/2012