There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Office of Family Assistance of the Administration for Children and Families of the Department of Health and Human Services relating to waiver and expenditure authority under section 1115 of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1315) with respect to the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
09/20/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 250 - 164 (Roll no. 589).(text: CR H6175)
09/18/2012Reported by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 112-677, Part II.
09/18/2012Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 112-677, Part I.
09/11/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
09/21/2012SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/20/2012-5:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/20/2012-5:00pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 250 - 164 (Roll no. 589). (text: CR H6175)
09/20/2012-4:35pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6194-6195)
09/20/2012-3:40pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - The chair put the question on agreeing to the joint resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. George Miller (CA) demanded the yeas and nays and further proceedings on the joint resolution were postponed.
09/20/2012-3:39pmHouseRESUMING CONSIDERATION OF H.J. RES. 118 - Pursuant to clause 1(c) of rule XIX, the Chair announced that consideration of H.J. Res. 118 would now resume.
09/20/2012-3:39pmHouseUNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was on the question of passage of H.J. Res. 118.
09/20/2012-3:39pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
09/20/2012-3:38pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - Pursuant to clause 1(C) of Rule 19, the Speaker postponed further proceedings on H.J. Res. 118.
09/20/2012-3:38pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6185)
09/20/2012-2:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 118.
09/20/2012-2:24pmHouseThe resolution provides for consideration of both H.J.Res. 118 and H.R. 3409. H.J. Res. 118 is debatable for one hour and is closed to amendments. H.R. 3409 is debatable for one hour and specified amendments are in order. Motions to recommit are in order. The resolution also provides for approval of the Journal on specified days; appointing of Members to perform duties of the Chair; not counting of legislative days for the purposes of the War Powers Act, purposes of clause 7 of rule XIII, and the purposes of clause 7(c)(1) of rule XXII.
09/20/2012-2:24pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 788. (consideration: CR H6174-6185)
09/18/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 489.
09/18/2012HouseReported by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 112-677, Part II.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
09/18/2012HouseReported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 112-677, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/13/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 16.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
09/13/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
09/13/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 14.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/13/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/11/2012HouseReferred to House Education and the Workforce
09/11/2012HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
09/11/2012HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/11/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/11/2012 Referred to
09/13/2012 Markup by
09/18/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-677,Part 1
House Education and the Workforce09/11/2012 Referred to
09/13/2012 Markup by
09/18/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-677,Part 2

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.J.Res.118. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/20/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Disapproves of the rule submitted by the Office of Family Assistance of the Administration for Children and Families of the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) relating to waiver and expenditure authority under the Social Security Act with respect to the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program. Declares that the rule shall have no force or effect.