Text: H.J.Res.118 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Received in Senate (09/21/2012)


112th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. J. RES. 118

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
September 21, 2012

Received


JOINT RESOLUTION

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Office of Family Assistance of the Administration for Children and Families of the Department of Health and Human Services relating to waiver and expenditure authority under section 1115 of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1315) with respect to the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program.

Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

That Congress disapproves the rule submitted by the Office of Family Assistance of the Administration for Children and Families of the Department of Health and Human Services relating to waiver and expenditure authority under section 1115 of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1315) with respect to the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program (issued July 12, 2012, as the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Information Memorandum Transmittal No. TANF–ACF–IM–2012–03, and printed in the Congressional Record on September 10, 2012, on pages S6047–S6050, along with a letter of opinion from the Government Accountability Office dated September 4, 2012, that the Information Memorandum is a rule under the Congressional Review Act), and such rule shall have no force or effect.

Passed the House of Representatives September 20, 2012.

Attest: karen l. haas,   
Clerk