Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/19/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/19/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/24/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/08/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 02/08/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/08/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/08/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/09/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/16/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/16/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/16/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/16/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/18/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/03/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/03/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/16/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/29/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/29/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/29/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/30/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/30/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/01/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/01/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/06/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/06/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/06/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/02/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/05/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/24/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/21/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/11/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/18/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/25/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/09/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/24/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/15/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/24/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/01/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/01/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/01/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/01/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/01/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/01/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/01/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/01/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/01/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/01/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/30/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/27/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/10/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/09/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/15/2012