Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/26/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/26/2011
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/10/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/17/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/17/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/19/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/26/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/29/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew