Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/08/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/15/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/02/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/18/2011