Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/21/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/21/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/21/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/29/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/29/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/29/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/29/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/29/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/29/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/29/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/29/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/29/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/08/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/08/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/08/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/08/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/06/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/06/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/06/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/06/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/17/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/17/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 11/17/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/17/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/30/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/30/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/30/2012