Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/16/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/16/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 02/16/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/28/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/28/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/28/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/28/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 02/28/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/28/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/28/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/28/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/28/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/28/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/28/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/28/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/01/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/01/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/01/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/01/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/01/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/09/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/09/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/09/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/09/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/09/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/14/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/14/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/14/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/15/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 03/15/2011