Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 03/08/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/09/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/10/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/15/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/29/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/05/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/07/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/13/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/24/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/24/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/15/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/22/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/06/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/11/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/21/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/22/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/06/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/06/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/05/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/29/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/23/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/11/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/11/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/11/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/11/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/21/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/19/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/19/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/19/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/19/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/19/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/27/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/27/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew