Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 04/07/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/13/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/13/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/13/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/13/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/13/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/13/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/13/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/13/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/14/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/14/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/14/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/15/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/15/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/15/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/03/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/04/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/04/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/11/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/11/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/26/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/03/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/07/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/15/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/04/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/04/2011