There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States giving Congress power to regulate campaign contributions for Federal elections.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/13/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
08/25/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/13/2011Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/13/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/29/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/18/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/20/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/09/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary07/13/2011 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution08/25/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.72.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.72. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/13/2011)

Constitutional Amendment - Gives Congress the power to prohibit, limit, and otherwise regulate the contribution of funds or donation of in-kind equivalents: (1) to candidates standing for election to a federal office in the United States, and (2) used to support or purchase media advertisements intended to influence the outcome of any such election.

Gives each of the several states the power to prohibit, limit, and otherwise regulate the contribution of funds or donation of in-kind equivalents: (1) to candidates standing for election to public office in the state, and (2) used to support or purchase media advertisements intended to influence the outcome of any such election or plebiscite in the state.

Prohibits any person who is not a U.S. citizen or is a foreign government, or acts as an agent of one, from: (1) contributing funds or donating in-kind equivalents to candidates standing for election to public office in the United States, or (2) otherwise expending funds or donating in-kind equivalents in a manner intended to influence the outcome of an election for public office or plebiscite in the United States.