Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/29/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/18/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/20/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/09/2012