Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 07/21/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/21/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/21/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/21/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/26/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/12/2011