Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/18/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/25/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/01/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 12/15/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/13/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/02/2012