Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 11/03/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/10/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/10/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/15/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/16/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/17/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/17/2012