Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 11/10/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 11/10/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/15/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 11/16/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/16/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/16/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 11/16/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/18/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/30/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/30/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/30/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/30/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/30/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/30/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/30/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 11/30/2011