Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/14/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/14/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 11/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/17/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/05/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/10/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/05/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/21/2012