Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/18/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/29/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/01/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/01/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/14/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/10/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/17/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/17/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/19/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/08/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/14/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/29/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/17/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 09/11/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/03/2012