Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/07/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/07/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/18/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 01/18/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 01/18/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/18/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/18/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 01/18/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/18/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 01/18/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/18/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/18/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 01/19/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/19/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 01/20/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/20/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/25/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/25/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/25/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/25/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/25/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/25/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/25/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/25/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/25/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/25/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/25/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/25/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/25/2011