Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/02/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/08/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/13/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/16/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/16/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/16/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/16/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/16/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/16/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/24/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/24/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/24/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/24/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/24/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/24/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/24/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/24/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/24/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/31/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/31/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/08/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/08/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/16/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/28/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/28/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/01/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/27/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/28/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/28/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/29/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/21/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/04/2012