Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/08/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/15/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/20/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/10/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/13/2012