Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/17/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/09/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/09/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/09/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/09/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/09/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/09/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/09/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/09/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/09/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/09/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/09/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/09/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/09/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/09/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/09/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/09/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/09/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/11/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/11/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/11/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/11/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/11/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/11/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/30/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/30/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/30/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/30/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/30/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/30/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/30/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/14/2011