Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/05/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/06/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/06/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/11/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/11/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/11/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/11/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/11/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/11/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/11/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/11/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/11/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/12/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/18/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/18/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/18/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/18/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/18/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/18/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/18/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/18/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/18/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/18/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/25/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/25/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/25/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/25/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/25/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/25/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/25/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/25/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/25/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/08/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/08/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/08/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/08/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/11/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/03/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/11/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/01/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/01/2011