Text: H.Res.127 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2011)


112th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. RES. 127

Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on the Judiciary in the One Hundred Twelfth Congress.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
February 28, 2011

Mr. Smith of Texas (for himself and Mr. Conyers) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on House Administration


RESOLUTION

Providing amounts for the expenses of the Committee on the Judiciary in the One Hundred Twelfth Congress.

Resolved,

SECTION 1. Amounts for Committee Expenses.

For the expenses of the Committee on the Judiciary (hereafter in this resolution referred to as the “Committee”), including the expenses of all staff salaries, there shall be paid, out of the applicable accounts of the House of Representatives for committee salaries and expenses, not more than $16,802,812.46 for the One Hundred Twelfth Congress.

SEC. 2. Session Limitations.

Of the amount specified in section 1—

(1) not more than $8,401,406.23 shall be available for expenses incurred during the period beginning at noon on January 3, 2011, and ending immediately before noon on January 3, 2012; and

(2) not more than $8,401,406.23 shall be available for expenses incurred during the period beginning at noon on January 3, 2012, and ending immediately before noon on January 3, 2013.

SEC. 3. Vouchers.

Payments under this resolution shall be made on vouchers authorized by the Committee, signed by the Chairman of the Committee, and approved in the manner directed by the Committee on House Administration.

SEC. 4. Regulations.

Amounts made available under this resolution shall be expended in accordance with regulations prescribed by the Committee on House Administration.