Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/10/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/12/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/14/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/14/2011