Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 03/15/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/15/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/16/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/16/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/16/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/17/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/17/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/17/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/17/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/17/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 03/17/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/17/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/17/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/29/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/29/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/29/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/30/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/31/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/01/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/04/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/17/2012