Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/29/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/01/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/04/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/12/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/12/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/12/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/14/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/02/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/02/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/02/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/02/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/10/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/24/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/24/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/01/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/02/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/07/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/24/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/06/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/06/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/15/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/22/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/07/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/08/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/20/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/20/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/20/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/03/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/04/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/05/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/12/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/05/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/21/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/30/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/07/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/07/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew