Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/29/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/13/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/08/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 08/01/2011