Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/17/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/30/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/30/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/23/2011