Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/02/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/02/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/08/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/14/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2011