Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/07/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 04/14/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/14/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/14/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/14/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/05/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 05/05/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/05/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/24/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/08/2011