There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for designation of the first Saturday in October as "National Animal Rescue Day" to create awareness, educate humans of the importance of adoption, and create a humane environment for any pet, including the importance of spaying and neutering of animals, and the encouragement of animal adoptions throughout the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/12/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/12/2011Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
04/12/2011Introduced in House

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/01/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/01/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/22/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/22/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/22/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/06/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/06/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/12/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/18/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/26/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/01/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/01/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/15/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/15/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/26/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/08/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/22/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/05/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/05/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/19/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/29/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/29/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/29/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/03/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/03/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/04/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/05/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/05/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/07/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/13/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/13/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/17/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/20/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform04/12/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.220.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.220. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/12/2011)

Supports the designation of a National Animal Rescue Day to create awareness for animal rescue programs throughout the year and address the challenge of overpopulation through continued spaying and neutering.