Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/01/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/01/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/01/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/01/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/22/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/22/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/22/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/22/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/22/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/06/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/06/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/12/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/18/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/26/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/01/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/01/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/15/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/15/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/26/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/08/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/22/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/07/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/05/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/05/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/19/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/29/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/29/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/29/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/03/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/03/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/04/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/05/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/05/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 12/07/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/13/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/13/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/17/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/20/2012