Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/02/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/10/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/24/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/24/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/24/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/22/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/17/2012