Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/06/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/12/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/12/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/12/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/18/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/18/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/19/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/20/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/25/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/25/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/10/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/10/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/10/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/10/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/10/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/10/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/10/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/10/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/10/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/10/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/10/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/14/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/14/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 02/14/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/14/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/14/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/14/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/18/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/18/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/18/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/03/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/03/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/03/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/03/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/03/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/03/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/03/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/03/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/03/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/11/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/11/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/11/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/16/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/16/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/16/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/16/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/29/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/29/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/31/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/31/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/31/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/31/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/31/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 03/31/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/01/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/01/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/04/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/04/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/04/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/06/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/06/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/06/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/06/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/08/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/08/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/08/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/15/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/15/2011
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/02/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/02/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/02/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/02/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/02/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/02/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/03/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/03/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 05/03/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/03/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/10/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/10/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/10/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/10/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/12/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/12/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/12/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/12/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/12/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/12/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/12/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/12/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/12/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/23/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/23/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/23/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/23/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 05/23/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/23/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/23/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/23/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/23/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/23/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/23/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/23/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/23/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/23/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/23/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/23/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/25/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/25/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/31/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/31/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 05/31/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/31/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/02/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/14/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 06/14/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/22/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/23/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/23/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/06/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/06/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/06/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/08/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/08/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/11/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/28/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 08/01/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 08/09/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/08/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/14/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/05/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/06/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/02/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/28/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/07/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/07/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/17/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 06/20/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/18/2012