Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/05/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/13/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/13/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/13/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/13/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/13/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/13/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/13/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/13/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/13/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 06/24/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/24/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/24/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/24/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/15/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/15/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/15/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/14/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/25/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/03/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/14/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/16/2012