Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/10/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/12/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/12/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 05/24/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/25/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/13/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/13/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/14/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/07/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/07/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/07/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/07/2011